HI SB1033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii maternal morbidity and mortality review panel within the department of health to conduct a comprehensive review of maternal deaths that have occurred in the State. (SD1)
Title
Maternal Morbidity and Mortality Review Panel; Department of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 405) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, JDL/WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |