HI SB1041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits written nondisclosure agreements involving sexual assault and sexual harassment as part of an employee's conditions of employment. Prohibits employers from retaliating against an employee for disclosing or discussing sexual harassment or sexual assault. (SB1041 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment Practices.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 954).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Eli, Matsumoto.
2019-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893).
2019-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 768).
2019-04-09HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-05HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19.
2019-04-05HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2204) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-02HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
2019-03-29HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-27HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-27HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-29-19 at 2:00PM.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-03-19HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 350) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 846) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-15SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB488 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback