HI SB105 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - (H) Act 173, on 6/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - (H) Act 173, on 6/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act; allows owner of real property to designate beneficiaries to receive real property upon death of owner without requirements of probate or formalities of wills. (CD1)
Title
Real Property; Probate
Sponsors
Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Shan Tsutsui [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | (H) Act 173, on 6/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). | |
2011-06-27 | (S) Act 173, 6/27/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) B. Oshiro, Choy, Brower, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Luke. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:05PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) B. Oshiro replaced Representative(s) Keith-Agaran as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Galuteria, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Keith-Agaran, Choy Co-Chairs; Brower, Luke, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 398). | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Deferred until 04-06-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 370). | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, M. Oshiro, Takai, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused (5). | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1301) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-24-11. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 662) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 140) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |