HI SB1058 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1058
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation out of the Hawaii Film and Creative Industries Development special fund. Amends the Hawaii Film and Creative Industries Development special fund to expand its funding sources and the authorized uses of the fund. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Film And Creative Industries Development Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1058 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB904 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
HB904 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).