HI SB1088 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee on EGH deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reallocates the Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax to carry out the intended sustainability purposes of section 128D-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and Act 73, Session Laws of Hawaii 2010. Repeals the sunset date in Act 73, and provides appropriations of the anticipated additional revenues. Removes the repeal date in Act 253, Session Laws of Hawaii 2007, as amended by Act 151, Session Laws of Hawaii 2012, for the Energy Systems Development Special Fund and periodic evaluation and plan of action requirements of the Energy Systems Development Special Fund.
Title
Sustainability ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Dela Cruz; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-08-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-07-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/AGL/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 3:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to ENE/AGL/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB857 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - Referred to ENE/AGL/EGH, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1088&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB1088_.htm |