HI SB1089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 137, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - (H) Act 137, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to exercise enforcement powers against an employer in a covered establishment. (CD1)
Title
Dislocated Workers; Enforcement Powers; Employers
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | (H) Act 137, on 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). | |
2011-06-21 | (S) Act 137, 6/20/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Keith-Agaran, M. Oshiro, Choy, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 8:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, McKelvey, Keith-Agaran, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Yamashita, Johanson. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Kim, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 502). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1155) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Marumoto, McKelvey, Morita, Nakashima excused (7). | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Reported from LAB/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Awana, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB/ERB on Tuesday, 03-01-11 11:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Referred to LAB/ERB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 29) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Kouchi, Taniguchi). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-11. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 281) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |