HI SB1093 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Act 062, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-01 - Act 062, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates mortgage servicer licensing and regulatory requirements including crediting of payments, payment of taxes and insurance, delinquencies and loss mitigation efforts, borrower complaints, fee and information disclosures, record maintenance, assignment of servicing rights, and prohibited activities. (SB1093 HD1)
Title
Mortgage Servicers; Mortgage Loan Delinquencies; Loss Mitigation; License; Bond; Duties; Prohibited Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Act 062, 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162). |
2015-06-01 | House | Act 062, on 05/28/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1162). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-22-15. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Cachola Co-Chairs; Har, McDermott. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 576). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:45PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be deferred until 04-07-15. |
2015-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-02-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1003), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 295) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Ruderman. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM, with Senator Riviere voting "Aye, with reservations." |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB924 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4