HI SB1102 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the counties to adopt an ordinance regulating the operation of hosting platforms that provide booking services for transient accommodation operators.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations Hosting Platforms.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM/EET, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1238 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1102 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
SB1102 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1102&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1102_.HTM |