HI SB1113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 190, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Act 190, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the scope of background checks conducted by the Department of Health on operators, employees, applicants, and volunteers in health care facilities and other persons providing health care on behalf of the Department of Health to include criminal history record checks, sex offender registry record checks, adult abuse perpetrator and child abuse and neglect record checks, and certified nurse aide registry record checks. (CD1)
Title
Background Checks; Employees, Prospective Employees, Applicants, or Operators of Healthcare Facilities and the State Department of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Act 190, 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2015-07-02 | House | Act 190, on 07/01/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1291). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48). |
2015-04-30 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Nakashima, Creagan, Hashem, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 8:15AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima, Creagan Co-Chairs; Hashem, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Espero, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Deferred until 04-14-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Deferred until 04-10-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 350). |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Har, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-06 | House | Deferred one day, Tuesday, 04-07-15. |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1372), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-31 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-31 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-31-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1151), recommending referral to JUD. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:45AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4). |
2015-03-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-18-15 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, LAB, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 302) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 687) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 369) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB944 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 4