HI SB1116 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that there is a presumption of a nexus for certain nonresident employees who telework. Amends the income tax law to apply to the total income of certain nonresident employees who telework. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2022.
Title
Relating To Telework.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1116 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
SB1116 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1116&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1116_.HTM |