HI SB1119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1119
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the purpose of engaging the community and developing plans for a potential future memorial, monument, or other appropriate means to properly honor and respectfully recognize the memory of those who lost their lives or were impacted by the August 2023 Maui wildfires. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Works Of Art Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2646) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-24 3:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1472 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
SB1119 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.