HI SB1147 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires condominium associations and planned community associations that have a service agreement with a towing company to maintain and provide to the towing company a "do not tow" list of authorized resident vehicles. Prohibits authorized vehicles that are on the "do not tow" list from being towed, unless authorized by certain individuals.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TCA, CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1147 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
HB893 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
HB893 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1147&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1147_.HTM |