HI SB1149 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows Employment and Training Fund moneys collected for the purpose of paying interest assessments on loans to the unemployment trust fund to be used for a period of one year for costs to administer, manage, report, and oversee Title I programs funded under the federal Workforce Investment Act of 1998 for which insufficient federal funds were allocated. Effective July 1, 2013.
Title
Workforce Investment Act; Department of Labor and Industrial Relations; Employment and Training Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB918 (Same As) 2013-06-18 - Act 101, 6/14/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1149&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB1149_.htm |