HI SB1151 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes restaurants with a liquor license to sell beer, malt beverages, or cider for off-premises consumption, under certain conditions. Authorizes retail dealers with a class 4 liquor license to sell beer, malt beverages, or cider in non-original packages, under certain conditions. Authorizes brewpubs and small craft producer pubs with a liquor license to sell malt beverages purchased from another liquor licensee for off-premises consumption. Effective July 1, 2020. (SD2)
Title
Liquor Licenses; Restaurant; Retail Dealer; Brewpub; Small Craft Producer Pub
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 318) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 572) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PSM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to PSM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, PSM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB770 (Same As) 2015-07-14 - Act 227, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).