HI SB1181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a certified fringe benefit reporting form which may be approved for use or provided by the department of labor and industrial relations that itemizes the cost of fringe benefits paid to both union and non-union laborers who perform work for the construction, alteration, or repair of public buildings and public works to be submitted weekly to the governmental contracting agency for review. Effective 07/01/2010. (SB1181 HD1)
Title
Little Davis Bacon Act; Fringe Benefits; Department of Labor and Industrial Relations
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Sagum, Saiki, Takai excused (3). | |
2009-03-24 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Awana, Pine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-09 9:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 329) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kim). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2009-02-26 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Nishihara. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-26-09 9:00am in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 198) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Bunda, Hee, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-17-09 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-09 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to LBR, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |