HI SB1181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1181
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to develop guidelines for the mandatory disclosure of cesspools on real property.
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/AEN, WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH/AEN. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1181 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
HB489 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB489 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1181&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1181_.HTM |