HI SB1197 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 237D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to repeal the misdemeanor for failing to register under chapter 237D and replacing it with a fine structure and to make various technical amendments.
Title
Relating To Transient Accommodations Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1197 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
HB1043 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 090, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
HB1043 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Act 090, on 06/25/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1197&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1197_.HTM |