HI SB1209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms the amount allowable for the Hawaii expenses for household and dependent care services necessary for the gainful employment tax credit to the credit amounts allowed in the federal tax code. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/22.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 01-26-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1209&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB1209_.HTM |