HI SB1218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 012, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 012, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes and the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, and deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes And The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, And Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Act 012, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Act 012, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1112). |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 544). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1706), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 363) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-27-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1357 (Same As) 2017-01-30 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6