HI SB1227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 158, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 158, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the affirmation requirement and form that is filed by an attorney on behalf of a mortgagee who is seeking to foreclose on a residential property under a judicial foreclosure action. Repeals the affirmation requirement of an attorney who files a complaint in a mortgage foreclosure action that would have been effective on 07/01/2017. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Foreclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 158, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2017-07-11 | House | Act 158, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1259). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 8) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 8). |
2017-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Ruderman. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, San Buenaventura Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 509). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Ward excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, McDermott. |
2017-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-17-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |