HI SB1236 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires installation of fiber optic cable systems in certain new condominiums and planned communities. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB1236 HD2)
Title
Infrastructure; Fiber Optic Cable; Condominiums; Planned Communities
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Wakai, Espero, Ige Co-Chairs; Baker Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 521). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1520-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Creagan, Evans, Ito, Nakashima, Oshiro, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har, C. Lee. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-12-14. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-10-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1185) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-15-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 358) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from EGH/TEC/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/TEC/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EGH/TEC/PSM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |