HI SB1246 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1246
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a county from enacting any ordinance that prohibits a person from lying by the roadside in safety in accordance with the law of the splintered paddle. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Law Of The Splintered Paddle.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:02PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1246 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB1083 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1083 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - The committee(s) on CAI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.