HI SB1265 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 286, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that an owner's agreement to locate and recover property that is presumed abandoned, shall be unenforceable and may be subject to an action to reduce the compensation amount if the agreement provides for compensation exceeding twenty-five percent of the total value of the property. Exempts an owner's agreement with an attorney to file a claim as to identified property or contest the administrator's denial of a claim from the application of section 523A-25, Hawaii Revised Statutes; provided that an owner's agreement with an attorney that provides for compensation shall not exceed twenty-five per cent of the total value of the property. Provides an exception to the twenty-five per cent limit for an owner's agreement with an attorney to maintain an action in circuit court upon approval of the court. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Owner's Agreement; Attorney's Fees; Unclaimed Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 286, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 286, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1392).
2013-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-13 (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1237)
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
2013-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 24).
2013-04-18HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
2013-04-18SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2013-04-17SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-13 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-13 1:30PM in conference room 016.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Ito, McDermott.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Ihara, Taniguchi, Slom.
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 629).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-04-04HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-04-13 2:17PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Ito.
2013-03-14HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Har, Ito.
2013-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:00PM in House conference room 325.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 367) in amended form (SD 1).
2013-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-02-28SenateReported from CPN/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom.
2013-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPN/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-28SenateReferred to CPN/JDL.
2013-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1150 (Same As) 2013-04-16 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback