HI SB1271 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a government attrition policy. Effective July 1, 2020. (SB1271 HD1)
Title
Government Attrition Policy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 710). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, LAB, referral sheet 58 | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Yamashita. | |
2009-04-17 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Tsutsui, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 650). | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 534). | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Berg, Ching, Finnegan, Hanohano, Marumoto, Pine, Takumi, Thielen, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Morita, Takai excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Berg, Herkes, Karamatsu, Keith-Agaran, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, Takai, Tokioka excused (9). | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1613) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, C. Lee, Sagum, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishimoto, Wooley. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-09 4:00 PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 361) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) One Day Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 762) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-02-27 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-03-09 9:30 AM in conference room 211. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Bunda, Hee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2009-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-19-09 2:45 PM in conference room 224. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 2/17/2009 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |