HI SB1273 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Act 015, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Act 015, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Insurance Commissioner to enforce consumer protections and market reforms relating to insurance of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. (SD1)
Title
Health Insurance; Compliance with Federal Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (S) Act 015, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Act 015, on 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1115). | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 387). | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Chang, Keith-Agaran, Saiki, Souki, Ward excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1433), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Marumoto. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-30-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 288) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1046 (Same As) 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).