HI SB1303 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1303
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of the department of budget and finance to conduct program and budget performance reviews of all state agencies biennially. Requires the director of finance to submit a report of the findings to the legislature at the start of each legislative biennial.
Title
Relating To Program And Budget Performance Review.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1303&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1303_.HTM |