HI SB1314 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1314
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the auditor to conduct a comprehensive management audit of the department of commerce and consumer affairs' division of consumer advocacy.
Title
Relating To The Division Of Consumer Advocacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1383 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
SB1314 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1314&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1314_.HTM |