HI SB1327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 230, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 230, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends or repeals various provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes or the Session Laws of Hawaii for the purposes of correcting errors and references, clarifying language, or deleting obsolete or unnecessary provisions. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Statutory Revision: Amending Or Repealing Various Provisions Of The Hawaii Revised Statutes Or The Session Laws Of Hawaii For The Purposes Of Correcting Errors And References, Clarifying Language, Or Deleting Obsolete Or Unnecessary Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 230, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2021-07-07 | House | Act 230, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 444). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1715), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325. |
2021-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 9:16AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB360 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.