HI SB1337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of "gambling" and "something of value" to clarify that participation in health wellness programs is not considered gambling or lottery participation under the Hawaii penal code. (SD2)
Title
Gambling; Wellness Programs; Health Insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-13-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-13-13. |
2013-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-11-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 378) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Ihara, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-13 2:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |