HI SB1342 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the forfeiture of any property used or taken in any violation of laws or rules that results in a petty misdemeanor.
Title
Petty Misdemeanor; Forfeiture
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 1:25PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1393 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1342&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1342_.HTM |