HI SB1344 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the imposition of restrictions on a person's ability to obtain or renew a driver's license or to register, renew the registration of, or transfer or receive title to a motor vehicle, as a consequence of unpaid monetary obligations. Does not affect driver's license suspensions related to excessive speeding, lack of motor vehicle insurance, or non-compliance with a child support order. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Debt.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 03-15-19 10:30AM in House conference room 423.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 918) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2019-02-14SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-02-07SenateRe-Referred to TRS, JDC.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback