HI SB1353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the University of Hawaii at Hilo to support Ka Haka Ula O Keelikolani college of Hawaiian language and student support programs at the University of Hawaii at Hilo to support native Hawaiians and native Hawaiian programs.
Title
University of Hawaii at Hilo; Hawaiian Language; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to THA/HRE, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1353&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB1353_.HTM |