HI SB1360 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 163, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 163, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the general excise tax exemptions for condominium common expenses paid by managers, submanagers, and suboperators and for hotel employee expenses paid by hotel operators and timeshare projects. Eliminates the aggregate cap of $400,000 for taxpayers eligible for the exemptions. (CD1)
Title
General Excise Tax Exemption; Hotel Operators; Timeshare Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 163, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 163, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har, Oshiro voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Wooley voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kawakami excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 86) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 86). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Ing, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kidani replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 3:15PM in conference room 309. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Luke Chair; Ing, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Galuteria, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 636). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cullen, Har, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 383) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Reported from THA/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 138) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in THA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, Kahele, Shimabukuro, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Kidani, Slom. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to THA/CPN, WAM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |