HI SB1361 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 160, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Act 160, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires "position ceilings" to be included in the executive budget and related documents. Requires a "position ceiling" to separately identify the maximum number of permanent and temporary positions authorized in the executive budget. Prohibits the expenditure of funds on certain positions exceeding the applicable ceiling, with certain exceptions. Authorizes department heads, with the approval of the governor, to establish positions for special, research, and demonstration projects, provided that funding is available for the positions (effective upon approval). States intent that the provisions also apply to the judiciary budget by operation of existing law. Effective 7/1/2016. (CD1)
Title
State Budget; Position Ceiling, Temporary Positions
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Act 160, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Act 160, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 76) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 76). |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kouchi. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 11:15AM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; LoPresti, Tupola. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Gabbard, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Choy voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1570), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1033) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 364) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-15 8:45AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |