HI SB1367 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 8:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 8:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the continued funding of Project Kealahou within the Child and Adolescent Mental Health Division of the Department of Health. Requires the Department of Health to submit an annual report on the program to the Legislature. (SB1367 HD1)
Title
Department of Health; Project Kealahou; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Chun Oakland, Inouye Co-Chairs; Gabbard, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1600), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Tokioka. |
2015-04-07 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1093) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 365) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 786) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 399) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:30PM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to HTH/HSH, WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6