HI SB1370 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the application of mandatory mortgage foreclosure dispute resolution by requiring mortgagees, at the mortgagor's election, to participate in mediation to avoid foreclosure or mitigate damages from foreclosure prior to filing a judicial foreclosure action for property that has been the mortgagor's primary residence for a specified period. Applies the dispute resolution requirement to judicial foreclosure actions filed prior to the effective date of this bill and pending an initial court hearing. Effective July 1, 2112. (SB1370 HD1)
Title
Mortgage Foreclosures; Judicial Foreclosure Actions for Residential Property; Mandatory Dispute Resolution; Mediation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1169) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Wooley, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Cabanilla, Ito. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Carroll, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Cachola, Har, Ito. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Thursday, 03-14-13 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 385) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-13 2:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-01-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-28-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-13 11:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 195) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1417 (Same As) 2013-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3).