HI SB1374 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans the sale of flavored tobacco products and mislabeled e-liquid products. Appropriates funds. Repeals certain provisions of the Hawaii Revised Statutes relating to the sale of tobacco products. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1374 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HHS, CPN/WAM.
HB1076 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
HB1076 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Re-referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1374&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB1374_.HTM |