HI SB1387 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates moneys to the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation for low-interest home construction and home improvement loans to holders of Ahupuaa O Kahana State Park residential leases. Lapses funds appropriated to the general fund on June 30, 2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ahupuaa o Kahana State Park.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from HOU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to HOU/WTL, WAM.
2019-01-24SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1398 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback