HI SB1453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1453
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the term "agency" includes the nonadministrative functions of the courts of the State for purposes of the Uniform Information Practices Act.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Information Practices Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1453 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
HB1478 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB1478 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1453&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB1453_.HTM |