HI SB1482 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 109, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 109, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Public Utilities Commission (PUC) to consider the benefits of capital improvements for renewable energy and energy efficiency despite the short-term expense. Requires the PUC to consider the need to reduce the State's reliance on fossil fuels. (CD1)
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 109, 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 109, on 6/14/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1212). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Herkes, M. Oshiro, Ito, Kawakami, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Baker, Ige, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 3:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 649). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Gabbard, Chair; Baker, Ige, Co-Chair(s); Ihara. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Coffman, Herkes, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Ito, Kawakami, Thielen. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 60 | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 599). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Deferred until 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 393). | |
2011-04-07 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Pine voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) M. Oshiro excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-07-11. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1420) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Saiki, Wooley excused (4). | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1004), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Chong, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 348) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 653) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from ENE/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 180) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 2:45PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to ENE/CPN, WAM. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |