HI SB1483 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 098, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - (H) Act 098, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a condominium association that includes time share units to list its name and address as the representative agent for individual time share owners from the records that the association is required to maintain unless the individual time share owner requests the association to maintain the individual owner's name and address in the association's records instead. (CD1)
Title
Condominium Associations; Maintenance of Time Share Owner Records
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | (H) Act 098, on 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). | |
2011-06-14 | (S) Act 098, 6/9/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1201). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Hee. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Deferred one day 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Deferred until 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 3). | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 3) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-26 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Herkes, Evans, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Kim, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Senator(s) Galuteria added as conferee(s). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Brower, Herkes Co-Chairs; Cabanilla, Evans, Hashem, Ching. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Kim, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 604). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-11. | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 404). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ching; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-04-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ching. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-11 9:45AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-23-11. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Monday, 03-21-11 9:15AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to TOU, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 349) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-11 8:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |