HI SB17 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an interim action level of 0.02 parts per billion for chromium-6 in drinking water. A final enforceable standard for chromium-6 shall be in place by January 1, 2013.
Title
Drinking Water; Chromium-6
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to HTH/ENE, WAM. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=17 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB17_.HTM |