HI SB17 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reallocates funds from the environmental response, energy, and food security tax. Extends the sunset date of the Energy Systems Development Special Fund and related provisions to June 30, 2015. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB17 HD1)
Title
Environmental Response, Energy, and Food Security Tax; Energy Systems Development Special Fund ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hanohano, McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (4). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1183) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-21 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Evans, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-13 8:35AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-13. |
2013-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-19-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 52) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Hee, Kim). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to ENE, WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB451 (Same As) 2013-02-20 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.