HI SB17 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Act 135, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Act 135, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the required disclosure of documents by a seller for residential real property that is subject to restrictions or conditions on use applies to documents relating to restrictions or conditions subject to section 508D-9, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Takes effect 11/1/2015. (CD1)
Title
Real Estate; Seller Disclosure Requirements; Required Documentation; Restrictions or Conditions on Use; Good Faith
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Act 135, 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2015-06-23 | House | Act 135, on 06/19/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1235). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 12) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 12). |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Rhoads, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 9:15AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Woodson, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 473). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kong, Oshiro, Say voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1622) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1146) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2015-03-18 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-18-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-15. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 11). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-15. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 547) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-19-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB272 (Same As) 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).