HI SB175 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB175
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to implement an on-site recycling program using rules issued by the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development, at buildings and facilities managed, maintained, or serviced by the Department of Accounting and General Services. Requires the Department of Health, in conjunction with the Office of Planning and Sustainable Development, to conduct a study on the benefits and costs in increasing reuse and reduce efforts throughout the State, recycling streams, and solid waste management in Hawaii. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Recycling.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from AEN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 387) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB175 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Accounting and General Services
Department of Health
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Recycling
State Facilities
Study
Department of Accounting and General Services
Department of Health
Office of Planning and Sustainable Development
Recycling
State Facilities
Study