HI SB197 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits police department officers and employees, department of public safety employees, department of land and natural resources employees, and department of transportation employees who are authorized to carry firearms from consuming alcohol or ingesting prescription medications that would impair the judgment or physical response of the employee while carrying a firearm; provided that employees who are taking part in an official criminal surveillance or undercover operation shall be exempt from this requirement. Prohibits these employees from consuming alcohol for an unspecified number of hours prior to carrying a firearm. (SD1)
Title
Firearms; State and County Employees and Officers; Alcohol; Prescription Medications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM/WTL/TRA, JDL. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |