HI SB197 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 107, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts candidates who are deemed elected, running unopposed, or unsuccessful after a primary or special primary election from the prohibition on donating excess campaign funds for charitable or scholarship purposes before the general election date. (SB197 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Campaign Finance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateAct 107, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
2019-06-25HouseAct 107, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 915).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-09HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
2019-04-09SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 644).
2019-04-05HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Nakamura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseDeferred one day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2079), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1517) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19.
2019-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 67).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB366 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback