HI SB199 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 660).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 660).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, under certain conditions, the reimbursement to the general fund from a non-general fund of the Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credit claimed by a taxpayer. Effective June 30, 2011. (SB199 HD1)
Title
Renewable Energy Technologies Income Tax Credit; Reimbursement
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 660). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Ito, Yamashita, Ward. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 432). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Belatti, Takai voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Takai voting no (2) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1449) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-17-11 9:40AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 104) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 520) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |