HI SB2001 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - (S) Vetoed on 07-01-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 648).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - (S) Vetoed on 07-01-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 648).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the tax credit for research activities for one year. Repeals the technology infrastructure and high technology business investment tax credits effective May 1, 2010. (SB2001 HD1)
Title
Tax Credit; Research Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | (S) Vetoed on 07-01-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 648). | |
2010-07-01 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 410). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-04-30 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 646). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 14 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Sakamoto, Taniguchi . 11 No(es): Senator(s) Baker, Bunda, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Green, Hemmings, Hooser, Ige, Ihara, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Deferred until 04-14-10. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-10. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-13-10. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-07-10 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2010-04-10 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-10-10 11:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 468). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 530). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Kim, Chair; Fukunaga, Co-Chair(s); Kidani, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 494). | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 437). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Finnegan, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, Bertram, Hanohano excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Finnegan, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-29-10 8:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-17-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fukunaga, Hee, Tokuda, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-10 9:30am in conference room 211. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |