HI SB203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires PSD to test all prospective deputy sheriffs beginning on 07/01/2014, for psychological fitness for the position. Requires PSD to establish a budget and an implementation plan providing for PSD's use of electric guns by 01/01/2015.
Title
Department of Public Safety; Electric Guns; Psychological Evaluations for Prospective Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDL. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=203&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB203_.HTM |